MO HB882 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Agri-Ready County Designation Program
Title
Establishes the Agri-Ready County Designation Program
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - HB 882 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - HB 882 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - HB 882 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1, BILL NOT HEARD |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 22, 2015, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |