MO HB698 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Motion Withdrawn (S) - Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Motion Withdrawn (S) - Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding tax incentives and tax credits
Title
Changes the laws regarding tax incentives and tax credits
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Motion Withdrawn (S) - Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) - REQUEST ROLL CALL TO BRING THE CCR BEFORE THE BODY. MOTION PASSED AYES: 31 NOES: 3 |
2013-05-17 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 153 |
2013-05-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 32 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 30 |
2013-05-16 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-05-07 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES ZERR, KRATKY, JONES(50) |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHMITT, RICHARD, KRAUS, JUSTUS, MCKENNA |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2013-05-06 | House | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 5 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 22 NOES: 11 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 9:30 AM, Senate Lounge |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 24, 2013, 12:00PM, OR UPON MORNING RECESS, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 43 |
2013-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, ADOPTED AYES: 120 NOES: 31 |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-10 | House | HCS #2 Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | HCS #2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |