MO HB690 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds hydrogen to the definition of "alternative fuel" and increases specified alternative fuel decal fees.
Title
Adds hydrogen to the definition of "alternative fuel" and increases specified alternative fuel decal fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB690&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0690I.htm |