MO HB664 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes income tax credits for qualified alternative fuel vehicles
Title
Authorizes income tax credits for qualified alternative fuel vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB664&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0664I.PDF |