MO HB505 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding child abuse and neglect

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding child abuse and neglect

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2013-07-09HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2013-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2013-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2013-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2013-05-17HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 145 NOES: 2
2013-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 149
2013-05-17HouseHouse Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 148
2013-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2013-05-17SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 33
2013-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 33
2013-05-17SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2013-05-17SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2013-05-15SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2013-05-13SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2013-05-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2013-05-09SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2013-05-07SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 8, 2013, 12:30PM, SCR 1
2013-04-18SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Education(S)
2013-04-15HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2013-04-15HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 4
2013-04-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150
2013-04-15HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2013-04-09HousePerfected (H)
2013-04-09HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2013-04-09HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2013-03-25HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-03-25HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-03-25HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-03-14HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-03-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2013-03-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2013-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-03-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-02-14HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2013-02-11HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-02-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback