MO HB436 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Iron County by adoption of an order or ordinance to hold a nonpartisan election for the office of sheriff
Title
Allows Iron County by adoption of an order or ordinance to hold a nonpartisan election for the office of sheriff
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB436&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0436I.htm |