MO HB259 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Dairy Revitalization Act of 2015
Title
Establishes the Missouri Dairy Revitalization Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - HB 259 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 110 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 19, 2015, 9:45am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 4, 2015, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-02-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Taken Up |
2015-01-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |