MO HB256 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to certain civil actions to recover damages
Title
Modifies provisions relating to certain civil actions to recover damages
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 |
2015-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred: Banking(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB256&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0256I.PDF |