MO HB248 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H)
Pending: House Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H)
Pending: House Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an employee who is injured on the job to select his or her own health care provider to cure and relieve the effects of the injury at the expense of the employer
Title
Allows an employee who is injured on the job to select his or her own health care provider to cure and relieve the effects of the injury at the expense of the employer
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Colona [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB248&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0248I.PDF |