MO HB242 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds making a terrorist threat to the list of offenses that school administrators must report
Title
Adds making a terrorist threat to the list of offenses that school administrators must report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues in Education(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB242&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0242I.PDF |