MO HB2184 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding alternative fuels
Title
Changes the laws regarding alternative fuels
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2184&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2184I.htm |