MO HB1689 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elementary and secondary education
Title
Changes the laws regarding elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-08 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 127 NOES: 18 |
2014-05-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 118 NOES: 21 |
2014-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 6 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 7, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 21 |
2014-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, ha 3 adopted |
2014-04-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |