MO HB1610 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reauthorizes the alternative fuel tax credit for six years and adds electric vehicles recharging properties to the list of eligible properties
Title
Reauthorizes the alternative fuel tax credit for six years and adds electric vehicles recharging properties to the list of eligible properties
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 91 NOES: 54 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Agri-Business(H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |