MO HB1411 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a person younger than 17 years of age using a tanning device in a tanning facility to have the parent or guardian of the minor give written consent in person to the minor's use of a tanning device

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a person younger than 17 years of age using a tanning device in a tanning facility to have the parent or guardian of the minor give written consent in person to the minor's use of a tanning device

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-05HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-06-05HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 103 NOES: 38
2014-05-12HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 105 NOES: 36
2014-05-12HouseTaken Up
2014-05-07SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS
2014-05-07SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 10
2014-05-07SenateSS Adopted (S)
2014-05-07SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2014-05-07SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-05-01SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-30SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge
2014-03-27SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S)
2014-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 46
2014-03-13HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-11HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED
2014-03-11HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-02-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-10HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-10HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-22HouseReferred: Health Care Policy(H)
2014-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback