MO HB1326 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Title
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-08 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-30 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2014-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-16 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 100 NOES: 40 |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 101 NOES: 38 |
2014-05-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 101 NOES: 38 |
2014-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 27 NOES: 4 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 4 |
2014-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted |
2014-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Agri-Business(H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |