MO HB1320 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a breastfeeding mother to use discretion and excuses breastfeeding mothers from jury service

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a breastfeeding mother to use discretion and excuses breastfeeding mothers from jury service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-04-03SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2014-04-01SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-04-01SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-03-31SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-03-31SenateSenate Message (S)
2014-03-31SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-03-31SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-03-31SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2014-03-28SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2014-03-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 PRESENT: 1
2014-03-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-26HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 adopted
2014-03-26HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-13HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-13HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2014-02-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2014-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-16HouseReferred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H)
2014-01-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback