MO HB132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel used in watercraft in this state
Title
Authorizes an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel used in watercraft in this state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - HB 132 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - HB 132 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 9 N: 120 NV: 17 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - House - HB 132 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - HB 132 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 9 N: 120 NV: 17 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - House - HB 132 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 16, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |