MO HB1217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies certain unlawful transfers or assignments of pension benefits
Title
Specifies certain unlawful transfers or assignments of pension benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-09 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 95 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 3 |
2014-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 132 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 2 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 132 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 2 |
2014-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 31 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Pensions(S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 3 |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |