MO HB1206 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the expiration date on the authority of certain public higher education institutions to transfer real property, except in fee simple, without General Assembly authorization
Title
Removes the expiration date on the authority of certain public higher education institutions to transfer real property, except in fee simple, without General Assembly authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) - Education |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 17 |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |