MO HB1189 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to adopt a high school graduation policy that allows certain agriculture or career and technical education courses to satisfy certain subject-specific graduation requirements
Title
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to adopt a high school graduation policy that allows certain agriculture or career and technical education courses to satisfy certain subject-specific graduation requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - SCA 1 defeated AYES: 29 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (S) - SCA 1 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 3 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-26 | House | Prefiled (H) |