MO HB1182 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Rules - No Action Taken (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Rules - No Action Taken (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals various obsolete, expired, and ineffective provisions of law
Title
Repeals various obsolete, expired, and ineffective provisions of law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - No Action Taken (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1182&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1182I.htm |