MN SF901 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - HF substituted on General Orders HF956
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Omnibus energy bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus energy bill

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-09SenateHF substituted on General Orders HF956
2013-05-07SenateSecond reading
2013-05-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2013-04-02SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Environment and Energy
2013-02-28SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback