MN SF382 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF157
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - HF substituted on General Orders HF157
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bullion coin dealers regulation, registration requirement, conduct prohibition, enforcement authority, criminal penalties and appropriation
Title
Bullion coin dealers regulation, registration requirement, conduct prohibition, enforcement authority, criminal penalties and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF157 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |