MN HF92 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Author added Kahn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Author added Kahn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage regulated, and overtime and parental leave provisions modified.
Title
Minimum wage regulated, and overtime and parental leave provisions modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: Take from Table (Y: 73 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Motion to Reconsider (Y: 69 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 99 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 69 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Motion to Reconsider (Y: 69 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 99 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 69 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Author added Kahn |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate conferees Eaton, Hayden, Tomassoni |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate conferees Eaton; Hayden; Tomassoni |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | House conferees Winkler; Metsa; Poppe |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill returned to conference committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Taken from table in House |
2014-02-25 | House | New conferees appointed Winkler, Metsa, Poppe |
2014-02-25 | House | New conference committee of 3 requested |
2014-02-25 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 73-58 |
2014-02-25 | House | Motion to take from table |
2014-02-25 | House | Author added Newton |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate conferees Eaton; Hayden; Tomassoni |
2013-05-10 | House | Senate conferees Eaton, Hayden, Tomassoni |
2013-05-10 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2013-05-09 | House | House conferees Winkler, Metsa, Poppe |
2013-05-09 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2013-05-09 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House conferees Winkler; Metsa; Poppe |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-28 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3, now on General Orders |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-05-03 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 68-62 |
2013-05-03 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amendment reconsidered Amendment was not adopted. |
2013-05-03 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 69-61 |
2013-05-03 | House | Motion for reconsideration Kieffer Amendment |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 3, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-04-11 | House | Authors added Melin and Freiberg |
2013-04-08 | House | Author added Isaacson |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion prevailed |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2013-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2013-03-07 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2013-03-04 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy vote: 70-58 |
2013-02-21 | House | Author changed Winkler (Chief) |
2013-01-24 | House | Authors added Slocum and Lien |
2013-01-22 | House | Authors added Dehn, R.; Clark; Anzelc and Moran |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Workplace and Regulated Industries |