MN HF826 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Author added Clark
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Author added Clark
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Safe and supportive schools provided by prohibiting bullying.
Title
Safe and supportive schools provided by prohibiting bullying.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Motion to Concur (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 73 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Motion to Concur (Y: 69 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 73 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 60 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Author added Clark |
2014-04-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 160 04/09/14 | |
2014-04-09 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-04-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-04-09 | Governor approval | |
2014-04-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-04-08 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 69-63 |
2014-04-08 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 69-63 |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments question recurred |
2014-04-08 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 57-66 |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-31 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee (Nelson amendment) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Education |
2014-03-03 | House | Author added Laine |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2013-05-19 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-05-06 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 72-57 |
2013-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-05-06 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 6, 2013 |
2013-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2013-04-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-04-04 | House | Author added Liebling |
2013-04-02 | House | Author added Isaacson |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2013-03-13 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2013-03-04 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |