MN HF367 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Author added Kahn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Author added Kahn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ranked-choice voting authorized; procedures for adoption, implementation, and use established.
Title
Ranked-choice voting authorized; procedures for adoption, implementation, and use established.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] |
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Author added Kahn |
2014-03-17 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2013-02-28 | House | Second reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-02-20 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2013-02-14 | House | Authors stricken Howe and Kelly |
2013-02-11 | House | Authors added Bly, Freiberg, Rosenthal and Erhardt |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections |