MN HF232 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 23 04/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 23 04/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Statutory short form power of attorney modified, and judicial relief authorized.
Title
Statutory short form power of attorney modified, and judicial relief authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] |
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Sen. Barbara Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-20 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 23 04/24/13 | |
2013-04-24 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-04-24 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2013-04-24 | Governor approval | |
2013-04-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-04-20 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 129-0 |
2013-04-20 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2013-04-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2013-04-20 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2013-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-04-20 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed as amended vote: 66-0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Taken from table |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Laid on table |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Special Order: Amendment offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF327 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF327, now on General Orders |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-11 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2013-04-11 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-02-20 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |