MN HF1952 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-09 - Author added Bernardy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Smart phone "kill switch" functionality required to deter theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smart phone "kill switch" functionality required to deter theft.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-09HouseAuthor added Bernardy
2014-05-06HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2014-05-06HouseBills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
2014-05-05HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1740
2014-03-24HouseSecond reading
2014-03-24HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2014-03-03HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2014-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Workplace and Regulated Industries

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback