MN HF1818 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - Author stricken Paymar
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - Author stricken Paymar
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana medical use permitted, fees set, rulemaking authorized, criminal and civil penalties provided, funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Marijuana medical use permitted, fees set, rulemaking authorized, criminal and civil penalties provided, funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Author stricken Paymar |
2014-03-24 | House | Author added Isaacson |
2014-03-17 | House | Author stricken Faust |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2013-05-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |