MI SCR0015 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to call on the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to withdraw their proposed rule expanding the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act.
Title
A concurrent resolution to call on the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to withdraw their proposed rule expanding the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-09-24 | House | Received In House |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |