MI SB1529 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0372'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management; purchasing; sheltered workshops and work activity centers; replace with community rehabilitation organizations and revise requirements. Amends secs. 293, 294, 295, 296 & 297 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1293 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management; purchasing; sheltered workshops and work activity centers; replace with community rehabilitation organizations and revise requirements. Amends secs. 293, 294, 295, 296 & 297 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1293 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-12-01 - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-29 Assigned Pa 0372'10 With Immediate Effect
2010-12-29 Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:26 Pm
2010-12-29 Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:42 Pm
2010-12-29 Presented To Governor 12/20/2010 @ 12:06 Pm
2010-12-15 Ordered Enrolled
2010-12-15 Full Title Agreed To
2010-12-15 Given Immediate Effect
2010-12-15 House Inserted Full Title
2010-12-15 Returned To Senate
2010-12-15 Inserted Full Title
2010-12-15 Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 619 Yeas 92 Nays 4
2010-12-15 Read A Third Time
2010-12-15 Placed On Immediate Passage
2010-12-15 Placed On Third Reading
2010-12-15 Read A Second Time
2010-12-01 Referred To Second Reading
2010-12-01 Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2010-11-09 Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life
2010-11-09 Read A First Time
2010-11-09 Received On 11/09/2010
2010-11-09 Passed Roll Call # 522 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2010-11-09 Placed On Immediate Passage
2010-11-09 Rules Suspended
2010-11-09 Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2010-11-09 Substitute S-2 Concurred In
2010-11-09 Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2010-11-09 Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2010-11-09 Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
2010-11-09 Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2010-09-29 Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism

Same As/Similar To

HB6527 (Same As) 2010-10-06 - Printed Bill Filed 09/30/2010

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback