MI SB1129 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sexual penetration without informing partner of hepatitis C virus infection; provide for. Amends sec. 13k, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13k). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1130'14
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sexual penetration without informing partner of hepatitis C virus infection; provide for. Amends sec. 13k, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13k). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1130'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 695 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-12-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Received On 12/13/2014 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 695 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Pappageorge |
Subjects
Crimes, penalties
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Health, diseases
State agencies (existing), community health
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Health, diseases
State agencies (existing), community health