MI SB0988 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; other; reimbursement for juvenile offender's incarceration and legal costs; provide for exemption. Amends secs. 18, 30 & 31, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.18 et seq.).
Title
Juveniles; other; reimbursement for juvenile offender's incarceration and legal costs; provide for exemption. Amends secs. 18, 30 & 31, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.18 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] |
Sen. Bruce Caswell [R] | Sen. Joseph Hune [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 585 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Received On 10/01/2014 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 585 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Pappageorge |