MI SB0981 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-01 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; marriage and divorce; contacting a party to a divorce action; prohibit for a certain time period. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 914.
Title
Family law; marriage and divorce; contacting a party to a divorce action; prohibit for a certain time period. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 914.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 583 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Received On 10/01/2014 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 583 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |