MI SB0979 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; definition of pneumatic guns; provide for, and prohibit certain regulations by local units of government. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 et seq.).
Title
Weapons; firearms; definition of pneumatic guns; provide for, and prohibit certain regulations by local units of government. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4 of 1990 PA 319 (MCL 123.1101 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 675 (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 561 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 561 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/29/2014 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2014 @ 5:06 Pm |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Immediate Effect Postponed |
2014-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 675 Yeas 71 Nays 35 |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 561 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |