MI SB0901 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; sexual assault kit evidence submission act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Law enforcement; other; sexual assault kit evidence submission act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bertram Johnson |
Same As/Similar To
HB5445 (Same As) 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 227'14
Subjects
Crime victims, other
Crimes, criminal sexual conduct
Criminal procedure, evidence
Health facilities, hospitals
Health, other
Law enforcement, investigations
Law enforcement, other
Law enforcement, reports
Law enforcement, state police
Crimes, criminal sexual conduct
Criminal procedure, evidence
Health facilities, hospitals
Health, other
Law enforcement, investigations
Law enforcement, other
Law enforcement, reports
Law enforcement, state police