MI SB0866 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-02 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-02 - Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing; crimes against elder adults; increase penalties for certain crimes against a person over 65 years of age. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by amending the heading of ch. XXA & by adding sec. 145s.
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing; crimes against elder adults; increase penalties for certain crimes against a person over 65 years of age. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by amending the heading of ch. XXA & by adding sec. 145s.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 674 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Received On 11/13/2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 674 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Virgil Smith |