MI SB0857 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0314'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 0314'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; liability; administration of a drug in response to a drug overdose; provide protection from civil liability. Amends 1963 PA 17 (MCL 691.1501 - 691.1507) by adding sec. 3.
Title
Torts; liability; administration of a drug in response to a drug overdose; provide protection from civil liability. Amends 1963 PA 17 (MCL 691.1501 - 691.1507) by adding sec. 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 504 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 380 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 380 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0314'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2014 @ 10:05 Am |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/13/2014 @ 9:36 Am |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/7/2014 @ 3:18 Pm |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-09-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 504 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Received On 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 380 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |
Same As/Similar To
HB5406 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary