MI SB0359 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; budget; revenue estimating conferences; require to include reporting of unfunded liabilities. Amends sec. 367b of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1367b).
Title
State financing and management; budget; revenue estimating conferences; require to include reporting of unfunded liabilities. Amends sec. 367b of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1367b).
Sponsors
Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] |
Sen. John Moolenaar [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |
Same As/Similar To
HB4748 (Same As) 2013-05-22 - Printed Bill Filed 05/22/2013