MI SB0340 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Status: Engrossed on September 15 2009 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-15 - Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life
Pending: House New Economy And Quality Of Life Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Economic development; economic development corporations; business ombudsman; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0002'09

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development; economic development corporations; business ombudsman; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0002'09

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-27 - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-09-15 Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life
2009-09-15 Read A First Time
2009-09-15 Received On 09/15/2009
2009-09-15 Passed Roll Call # 454 Yeas 20 Nays 14 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2009-09-10 Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended
2009-09-10 Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In
2009-09-10 Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s)
2009-08-27 Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
2009-08-27 Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
2009-08-27 Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2
2009-03-05 Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback