MI SB0324 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 20 2009 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-20 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; specialty plates for ducks unlimited; provide for. Amends sec. 811e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811e) & adds sec. 811r.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; fund-raising registration plates; specialty plates for ducks unlimited; provide for. Amends sec. 811e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811e) & adds sec. 811r.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-20 Referred To Committee On Transportation
2009-05-20 Read A First Time
2009-05-20 Received On 05/20/2009
2009-05-20 Passed Roll Call # 199 Yeas 30 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2009-05-19 Placed On Order Of Third Reading
2009-05-19 Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2009-05-13 Referred To Committee Of The Whole
2009-05-13 Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
2009-05-13 Reported Favorably Without Amendment
2009-03-04 Referred To Committee On Transportation

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback