MI SB0302 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-22 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-22 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State; symbol; "Purple Heart State"; designate. Creates new act.
Title
State; symbol; "Purple Heart State"; designate. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Caswell [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] | Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] |
Sen. Mike Nofs [R] | Sen. Steven Bieda [D] | Sen. James Marleau [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 205 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-22 | House | Received On 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 205 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Bruce Caswell |