MI SB0059 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Status: Vetoed on December 27 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-12-27 - Vetoed By Governor 12/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Weapons; licensing; concealed weapons licensing boards; eliminate, and transfer powers to secretary of state. Amends secs. 2a, 4, 5, 5a, 5b, 5c, 5d, 5e, 5f, 5j, 5k, 5l, 5m, 5o, 6a & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422a et seq.) & adds sec. 5x.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons; licensing; concealed weapons licensing boards; eliminate, and transfer powers to secretary of state. Amends secs. 2a, 4, 5, 5a, 5b, 5c, 5d, 5e, 5f, 5j, 5k, 5l, 5m, 5o, 6a & 8 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422a et seq.) & adds sec. 5x.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1052 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 821 (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 791 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Reported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-27SenateVetoed By Governor 12/18/2012
2012-12-27SenatePresented To Governor 12/18/2012 @ 1:03 Pm
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13Senate Roll Call # 1052 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-13SenateHouse Substitute H-4 Concurred In
2012-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 821 Yeas 68 Nays 41
2012-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-13HouseSubstitute H-4 Adopted
2012-12-13HouseSubstitute H-2 Not Adopted
2012-12-13HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2012-11-29HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation
2012-11-29HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-29HouseReceived On 11/29/2012
2012-11-29SenatePassed Roll Call # 791 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-29SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-11-29SenateRules Suspended
2012-11-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5
2012-11-29SenateSubstitute S-5 Concurred In
2012-11-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5
2012-03-27SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
2012-03-27SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-3
2012-02-01SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes
2012-02-01SenateReported Favorably With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes
2011-01-25SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0059
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0059.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0059.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0059.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-02-01-009.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-03-27-031.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback