MI HJRN | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; tuition; public universities to offer in-state tuition to certain veterans; require. Amends secs. 5 & 6, art. VIII of the state constitution.
Title
Higher education; tuition; public universities to offer in-state tuition to certain veterans; require. Amends secs. 5 & 6, art. VIII of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 233 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-14 | House | Adopted By 2/3 Vote Roll Call # 233 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2014-05-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-12 | House | Printed Joint Resolution Filed 03/08/2013 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Stamas |
Subjects
Constitutional amendments, state
Higher education, state universities
Higher education, tuition
Veterans, benefits
Higher education, state universities
Higher education, tuition
Veterans, benefits