MI HJRGG | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-17)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; board members; state board of education; require members to be elected from single-member districts. Amends sec. 3, art. VIII of the state constitution.
Title
Education; board members; state board of education; require members to be elected from single-member districts. Amends sec. 3, art. VIII of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-29 | House | Printed Joint Resolution Filed 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2014-05-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Ed Mcbroom |