MI HCR0032 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge the Congress of the United States to approve President Obama’s budget proposal to provide $35 million to help communities process evidence from untested sexual assault kits.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge the Congress of the United States to approve President Obama’s budget proposal to provide $35 million to help communities process evidence from untested sexual assault kits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-05 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2014-06-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-05-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Sarah Roberts |