MI HCR0031 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to call on the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to withdraw their proposed rule expanding the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act.
Title
A concurrent resolution to call on the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to withdraw their proposed rule expanding the definition of "waters of the United States" under the Clean Water Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-05 | House | Adopted And Transmitted |
2014-06-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-05-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |