MI HB5748 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; reference to certain repealed definition in the penal code; eliminate. Amends sec. 2 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422).
Title
Weapons; firearms; reference to certain repealed definition in the penal code; eliminate. Amends sec. 2 of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.422).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 570 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 570 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-11-12 | House | Transmitted |
2014-11-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 570 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2014-11-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/10/2014 |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Bruce Rendon |