MI HB5636 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 492'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 492'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; operation of golf cart on public highway without requirement of no-fault insurance; allow. Amends sec. 3101 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3101). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5045'13
Title
Insurance; no-fault; operation of golf cart on public highway without requirement of no-fault insurance; allow. Amends sec. 3101 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.3101). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5045'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 772 (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 872 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 534 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 872 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 534 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 492'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/13/2015 @ 3:56 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:52 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:12 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 772 Yeas 105 Nays 5 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 872 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-10-02 | House | Transmitted |
2014-10-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 534 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2014-10-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-10-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-06-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/05/2014 |
2014-06-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-06-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |