MI HB5438 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 317'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 317'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; driver training; training to enhance motorcycle and bicycle awareness; provide for. Amends sec. 37 of 2006 PA 384 (MCL 256.657).
Title
Vehicles; driver training; training to enhance motorcycle and bicycle awareness; provide for. Amends sec. 37 of 2006 PA 384 (MCL 256.657).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 558 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 605 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 342 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 605 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 342 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 317'14 |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2014 @ 11:54 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/14/2014 @ 9:20 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:54 Pm |
2014-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-02 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 558 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2014-10-02 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-10-02 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 605 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Transportation |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-04 | House | Transmitted |
2014-06-04 | House | Passed Roll Call # 342 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-06-04 | House | Amended |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-04-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/28/2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-03-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Terry Brown |